TX SB919 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the shared work unemployment compensation program.
Title
Relating to the shared work unemployment compensation program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Economic Development |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |