TX SJR52 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to exempt from ad valorem taxation real property leased to certain schools organized and operated primarily for the purpose of engaging in educational functions.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to exempt from ad valorem taxation real property leased to certain schools organized and operated primarily for the purpose of engaging in educational functions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB1455 (Enabled by) 2013-04-11 - Left pending in subcommittee
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SJR52 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SJ00052I.htm |