TX SJR52 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment repealing the requirement that state officers elected by voters statewide reside in the state capital.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment repealing the requirement that state officers elected by voters statewide reside in the state capital.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - SJR 52Third Reading House (Y: 102 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-05-26 - House - SJR 52Third Reading House (Y: 97 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 98 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-05-25 - House - SJR 52Third Reading House (Y: 94 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-05-26 - House - SJR 52Third Reading House (Y: 97 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - 3rd Reading Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 98 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-05-25 - House - SJR 52Third Reading House (Y: 94 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2015-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-27 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2015-05-27 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2015-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-25 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2015-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-15 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |