US HB1153 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Mortgage Choice Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Truth in Lending Act to specify that neither escrow charges for insurance nor affiliated title charges shall be considered "points and fees" for purposes of determining whether a mortgage is a "high-cost mortgage." (A high-cost mortgage designation restricts the terms of the loan and requires a lender to make certain disclosures to the borrower.)
Title
Mortgage Choice Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] |
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. David Trott [R-MI] |
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - On passage RC# 64 (Y: 280 N: 131 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2018-02-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-02-08 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 280 - 131 (Roll no. 64). |
2018-02-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H981-982) |
2018-02-07 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 1153, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill, and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Hensarling demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until a time to be announced. |
2018-02-07 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2018-02-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1153. |
2018-02-07 | House | The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The resolution also waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the legislative day of February 9, 2018. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of February 8, 2018 or February 9, 2018 for the Speaker to entertain motions to suspend the rules. |
2018-02-07 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 725. (consideration: CR H906-965; text: CR H907) |
2018-02-05 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 725 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The resolution also waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the legislative day of February 9, 2018. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of February 8, 2018 or February 9, 2018 for the Speaker to entertain motions to suspend the rules. |
2018-01-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 387. |
2018-01-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-522. |
2017-11-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 46 - 13. |
2017-11-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB10 (Related) 2017-07-13 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-108.
HR725 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6147 (Related) 2018-09-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB6746 (Related) 2018-09-07 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HR725 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6147 (Related) 2018-09-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB6746 (Related) 2018-09-07 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
User charges and fees
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
User charges and fees