US HB1292 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Energy Production Freedom Act - Amends the Clean Air Act to: (1) exclude from the definition of the term "air pollutant" carbon dioxide, methane, nitrous oxide, hydrofluorocarbons, perfluorocarbons, or sulfur hexafluoride; and (2) declare that nothing in the Act shall be treated as authorizing or requiring the regulation of climate change or global warming.
Title
Energy Production Freedom Act
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2011-03-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB97 (Related) 2011-02-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
HB1023 (Related) 2011-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
HB1023 (Related) 2011-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1292/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1292/BILLS-112hr1292ih.pdf |