US HB1304 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To approve the settlement of water rights claims of the Pueblos of Acoma and Laguna in the Rio San José Stream System and the Pueblos of Jemez and Zia in the Rio Jemez Stream System in the State of New Mexico, and for other purposes.
Title
Rio San José and Rio Jemez Water Settlements Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Gabe Vasquez [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB595 (Same As) 2023-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 274.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/1304/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr1304/BILLS-118hr1304ih.pdf |