US HB1390 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Joint Venturing Act of 2015 This bill amends the Small Business Act to revise requirements with respect to solicitation of offers for bundled contracts issued by the head of a federal agency that allows a small business to submit an offer (bid) that provides for the use of a particular team of subcontractors for the performance of the contract. The small business is also permitted to bid on a bundled or consolidated contract that provides for the use of a joint venture of small businesses.
Title
Small Business Joint Venturing Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2015-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1481 (Related) 2016-04-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 390.
SB958 (Related) 2016-06-28 - By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 114-288.
HB1735 (Related) 2015-10-22 - Vetoed by President.
SB958 (Related) 2016-06-28 - By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 114-288.
HB1735 (Related) 2015-10-22 - Vetoed by President.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1390/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1390/BILLS-114hr1390ih.pdf |