US HB144 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-11)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To forestall the loss of research talent by establishing a temporary early career research fellowship program.
Title
Supporting Early-Career Researchers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] |
Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] |
Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] |
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] |
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] |
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Rep. James Baird [R-IN] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2021-05-18 | House | Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 403, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 144, as amended; H.R. 204, as amended; H.R. 210, as amended; H.R. 240; H.R. 707, as amended; H.R. 711, as amended; H.R. 1157, as amended; H.R. 1447, as amended; H.R. 1510, as amended; H.R. 1711, as amended; H.R. 2027; H.R. 2167, as amended; H.R. 2441; H.R. 2494; H.R. 2533; H.R. 2655, as amended; H.R. 2695, H.R. 2704; H.R. 2788; H.R. 2878, as amended; and H.R. 3008. (consideration: CR H2482-2520; text: CR H2482) |
2021-05-18 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 403, proceedings on H.R. 144 are considered vacated. |
2021-05-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-05-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 144. |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2390-2392; text: CR H2390-2391) |
2021-05-17 | House | Ms. Bonamici moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 4. |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 117-16. |
2021-03-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2021-01-04 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E3) |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB637 (Related) 2021-03-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HR403 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR403 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.