US HB1583 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Contractor's Clarification Act of 2015 This bill amends the Small Business Act to revise the federal procurement requirements of the Administrator of the Small Business Administration (SBA) with respect to small business contracts for articles, equipment, supplies, services or materials, or to perform construction work for the government. The permission to submit an offer for a procurement contract, even though the offeror is not the actual manufacturer or processor of the product in question, is extended to additional kinds of small businesses, including: women-owned small businesses; HUBZone small businesses, and small businesses owned and controlled by service-disabled veterans. Contracts whose principal purpose is acquisition of services or construction are exempt from this Act. Limitations on SBA subcontracting are revised to require contracts that are principally for supplies from a regular dealer in such supplies, and that are not contracts principally for services or construction, to supply the product of a domestic small business manufacturer or processor, unless a waiver is granted by the Administrator under specified conditions.
Title
Small Business Contractor's Clarification Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Cresent Hardy [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1597 (Related) 2015-08-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HB1481 (Related) 2016-04-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 390.
HB1735 (Related) 2015-10-22 - Vetoed by President.
HB1481 (Related) 2016-04-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 390.
HB1735 (Related) 2015-10-22 - Vetoed by President.
Subjects
Commerce
Disability and paralysis
Economic development
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
Disability and paralysis
Economic development
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1583/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1583/BILLS-114hr1583ih.pdf |