US HB1762 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Federal Trade Commission to submit to Congress a report on unfair or deceptive acts or practices targeted at Indian Tribes or members of Indian Tribes, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting Indian Tribes from Scams Act
Sponsors
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 408 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2021-04-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-04-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 10 (Roll no. 111). (text: 04/14/2021 CR H1761) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1830-1831) |
2021-04-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-04-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1762. |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1761-1762) |
2021-04-14 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1880 (Related) 2022-05-18 - By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-112.
SB1897 (Same As) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.
SB1897 (Same As) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.