US HB1869 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Confirms that the applicable recovery period for qualified improvement property (nonresidential real estate) for depreciation purposes is 15 years under the modified accelerated cost recovery system (MACRS) and 20 years under the alternative depreciation system (ADS).
Title
Restoring Investment in Improvements Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB803 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3296 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB3296 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1869/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1869/BILLS-116hr1869ih.pdf |