US HB2227 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the authority of certain family members of a servicemember who dies or becomes catastrophically ill or injured while in military service to terminate a property lease or motor vehicle lease executed by the servicemember. Specifically, the bill allows a dependent of such a servicemember to terminate such a lease during the one-year period following the servicemember's death. Under current law, only the servicemember's spouse may do so. Current law also allows the spouse of such a servicemember to terminate such a lease during the one-year period after the servicemember incurs a catastrophic illness or injury. The bill specifies that this authority applies only if the servicemember lacks the mental capacity to manage his or her own affairs; otherwise, the servicemember, but not the spouse, may terminate the lease during the one-year period.
Title
Gold Star Spouses and Spouses of Injured Servicemembers Leasing Relief Expansion Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-02-25 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1174) |
2020-02-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2227. |
2020-02-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1174-1175) |
2020-02-25 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-29 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged. |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1118 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB3854 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB3854 (Related) 2020-06-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Disability and paralysis
Landlord and tenant
Lease and rental services
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
Motor vehicles
National Guard and reserves
Disability and paralysis
Landlord and tenant
Lease and rental services
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
Motor vehicles
National Guard and reserves