US HB2864 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Improving Access to Capital Act (Sec. 1) This bill exempts, under Regulation A+, certain fully reporting issuers of securities from specified disclosure requirements. Under current law, Regulation A+ exempts certain smaller offerings from securities registration requirements but applies only to non-reporting issuers.
Title
Improving Access to Capital Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] |
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 440 (Y: 403 N: 3 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2017-09-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-09-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 3 (Roll no. 440). (text: CR H6641) |
2017-09-05 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6644) |
2017-09-05 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-09-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2864. |
2017-09-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6641-6643) |
2017-09-05 | House | Mr. Hultgren moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-09-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 210. |
2017-09-05 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-292. |
2017-07-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 59 - 0. |
2017-07-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Licensing and registrations
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Licensing and registrations
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)