US HB3134 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-10 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7950)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-10 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7950)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Healthcare Innovation Zone Program Act of 2009 - Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish a Healthcare Innovation Zone (HIZ) pilot program, consisting of an HIZ planning grant program and an HIZ demonstration project, to increase health care provider integration and align health care provider incentives to improve health and reduce health care costs. Defines an "HIZ" as an integrated health care delivery network that works with local employers, community leaders, and private and governmental payors in a geographic region and that: (1) provides a full spectrum of care, including inpatient, outpatient, post-acute, and preventive care, to individuals, including Medicare beneficiaries; (2) has an academic medical center that provides tertiary and quaternary care, has existing capabilities to conduct health services research, and provides clinical training for health professionals; and (3) is able to accept alternative payment structures beyond fee-for-service and per diem amounts. Directs the Secretary to award between 10 and 25 grants of $250,000 to $1 million each to eligible entities for purposes of researching and preparing an HIZ model plan. Lists required contents of a plan, including: (1) a description of innovative models of care that improve quality and decrease costs; (2) a provider network that will provide the full spectrum of care; and (3) a target population and mechanisms to enroll such population. Directs the Secretary to: (1) establish an HIZ demonstration project to test the effectiveness of HIZs in increasing health care provider integration, improving health care services, and reducing health care costs; and (2) select project participants from HIV model plan grant recipients. Requires the project to operate for at least three years, subject to renewal at the Secretary's discretion. Requires an HIZ established under this Act to provide comprehensive health care services to individuals who voluntarily enroll to receive such services for multi-year periods from the HIZ.
Title
Healthcare Innovation Zone Program Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-10 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7950) | |
2009-07-09 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-07-08 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2009-07-08 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-07-08 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3664 (Related) 2009-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Computers and information technology
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Medical research
Computers and information technology
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Medical research
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3134/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3134/BILLS-111hr3134ih.pdf |