US HB325 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Avra/Black Wash Reclamation and Riparian Restoration Project - Amends the Reclamation Wastewater and Groundwater Study and Facilities Act to authorize the Secretary of the Interior, in cooperation with Pima County, Arizona, to participate in the planning, design, and construction of water recycling facilities and to enhance and restore riparian habitat in the Black Wash Sonoran Desert ecosystem in Avra Valley west of the metropolitan Pima County area. Limits the federal share of the project's cost to 25%. Authorizes appropriations. Permits federal funds provided by this Act to be used only for the design, planning, and construction of water-related infrastructure.
Title
Avra/Black Wash Reclamation and Riparian Restoration Project
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. | |
2009-06-03 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. | |
2009-06-02 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-06-02 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6019) | |
2009-06-02 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 325. | |
2009-06-02 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6019) | |
2009-06-02 | Mrs. Christensen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power. | |
2009-01-08 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Arizona
Lakes and rivers
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Arizona
Lakes and rivers
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection