US HB4126 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 71-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Guantanamo Transfer Prevention Act This bill prohibits the President from using Department of Defense (DOD) funds to transfer or release to or within the United States, its territories, or possessions Khalid Sheikh Mohammed or any other detainee who is not a U.S. citizen or member of the U.S. Armed Forces and is or was held on or after January 20, 2009, at United States Naval Station, Guantanamo Bay, Cuba, by DOD. Any contravening action by the President shall be without legal effect. No amounts authorized to be appropriated or otherwise made available for DOD for FY2016 may be used to: (1) close or abandon Guantanamo, (2) relinquish control of Guantanamo to Cuba, or (3) implement a material modification to the Treaty Between the United States of America and Cuba signed at Washington, DC, on May 29, 1934, that constructively closes Guantanamo.
Title
Guantanamo Transfer Prevention Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2015-11-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1735 (Related) 2015-10-22 - Vetoed by President.
SB1376 (Related) 2015-05-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 88.
SB1376 (Related) 2015-05-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 88.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Caribbean area
Cuba
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Detention of persons
Executive agency funding and structure
Latin America
Military facilities and property
Terrorism
Caribbean area
Cuba
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Detention of persons
Executive agency funding and structure
Latin America
Military facilities and property
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/4126/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr4126/BILLS-114hr4126ih.pdf |