US HB419 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rocky Mountain National Park Wilderness and Indian Peaks Wilderness Expansion Act - Designates certain lands in Rocky Mountain National Park, Colorado, as the Rocky Mountain National Park Wilderness (the Wilderness) and as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System. Provides for the inclusion of specified potential wilderness land within the Park in such Wilderness. Sets forth provisions: (1) governing continued operations at the Grand River Ditch; and (2) concerning water rights and permitted and prohibited activities within such Wilderness. Directs the Secretary of the Interior to establish an alignment line and identify the boundaries for the East Shore Trail within the East Shore Trail Area. Authorizes necessary adjustments in such boundaries, except any that would place any portion of the Trail in such Wilderness. Includes any portion of such Area that is not traversed by the Trail, that is not west of the Trail, and that is not within 50 feet of the centerline of the Trail in such Wilderness. Amends the Indian Peaks Wilderness Area, the Arapaho National Recreation Area and the Oregon Islands Wilderness Area Act to adjust the boundaries of: (1) the Indian Peaks Wilderness Area; and (2) the Arapaho National Recreation Area. Applies provisions governing leases of National Park System buildings and property to property known as the Leiffer tract near the Park's eastern boundary in Larimer County, Colorado.
Title
Rocky Mountain National Park Wilderness and Indian Peaks Wilderness Expansion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Betsy Markey [D-CO] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-01-09 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB146 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-11.
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
SB190 (Same As) 2009-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S232-234)
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
SB190 (Same As) 2009-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S232-234)
Subjects
Colorado
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/419/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr419/BILLS-111hr419ih.pdf |