US HB4336 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 to provide for project delivery programs, and for other purposes.
Title
NEPA State Assignment Expansion Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2021-07-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-07-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3814 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB4336 (Related) 2021-07-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB717 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB719 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB4336 (Related) 2021-07-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB717 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB719 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4336/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4336/BILLS-117hr4336ih.pdf |