US HB4537 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
International Insurance Standards Act of 2018 (Sec. 3) This bill prohibits parties representing the federal government in an international insurance agreement from agreeing to any standard unless it recognizes the existing U.S. system of regulation as satisfying that standard. (Sec. 4) In developing international insurance standards, the parties must coordinate with state insurance regulators. (Sec. 5) Parties representing the United States in such proceedings must consult with and notify Congress regarding the intention to participate in the negotiations, the nature and objectives of the negotiations, and the details of the agreement. (Sec. 6) Before entering into any agreement, the parties must report to Congress regarding the implementation and impact of the agreement. (Sec. 7) The bill amends the Federal Insurance Office Act of 2010 to modify requirements for an international agreement entered into by the Department of the Treasury's Federal Insurance Office. Such an agreement must only apply on a prospective basis. In developing an agreement, the parties must coordinate with state insurance regulators. Congress has the power to review and disapprove by joint resolution any agreement.
Title
International Insurance Standards Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] |
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] |
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] |
Rep. David Young [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2018-07-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6007-6008) |
2018-07-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4537. |
2018-07-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6007-6010) |
2018-07-10 | House | Mr. Huizenga moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 623. |
2018-07-03 | House | Committee on Rules discharged. |
2018-07-03 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-804, Part I. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 56 - 4. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-12-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-12-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3762 (Related) 2017-09-13 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB488 (Related) 2018-07-18 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
SB488 (Related) 2018-07-18 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Finance and financial sector
Insurance industry and regulation
Legislative rules and procedure
State and local government operations
Trade agreements and negotiations
Finance and financial sector
Insurance industry and regulation
Legislative rules and procedure
State and local government operations
Trade agreements and negotiations