US HB4629 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-18 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8232)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-18 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8232)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to establish quality measures regarding biosimilar biological products under the five-star performance rating system for Medicare Advantage plans. The measures must assess the level of access that plans provide to covered biosimilars, including with respect to formularies, cost-sharing, and utilization management. The CMS must also incorporate such measures into similar rating systems for plans under the Medicare prescription drug benefit.
Title
Star Rating for Biosimilars Act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-18 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8232) |
2019-10-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2543 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 225.
HB3 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
SB4199 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4228)
HB3 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
SB4199 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4228)
Subjects
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Medicare
Performance measurement
Prescription drugs
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Medicare
Performance measurement
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4629/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4629/BILLS-116hr4629ih.pdf |