US HB4636 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-14)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening the Child Welfare Response to Trafficking Act of 2014 - Amends the Child Abuse Prevention and Treatment Act to require that the state plan under the Act certifies that the state has in effect and is enforcing a state law, or is operating a statewide program, relating to child abuse and neglect that includes provisions and procedures requiring: (1) identification and assessment of reports involving child trafficking, and (2) training child protective services workers about identifying and providing services for such children.
Title
Strengthening the Child Welfare Response to Trafficking Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2014-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2744 (Related) 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
SB1118 (Related) 2013-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1118 (Related) 2013-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Child safety and welfare
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal justice information and records
Human trafficking
Sex offenses
Social welfare
State and local government operations
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal justice information and records
Human trafficking
Sex offenses
Social welfare
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4636/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4636/BILLS-113hr4636ih.pdf |