US HB555 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amateur Radio Parity Act of 2017 (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to amend station antenna structure regulations to prohibit a private land use restriction from applying to amateur radio stations if the restriction: precludes communications in an amateur radio service, fails to permit a licensee of amateur radio service to install and maintain an effective outdoor antenna on property under its exclusive use or control, or is not the minimum practicable restriction to accomplish the lawful purposes of a community association seeking to enforce the restriction. Before installing an outdoor antenna, however, an amateur radio licensee must obtain a community association's prior approval. A community association may: (1) prohibit installations on common property not under the exclusive control of the licensee, and (2) establish installation rules for amateur radio antennas and support structures.
Title
Amateur Radio Parity Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2017-01-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-01-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H581-582) |
2017-01-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 555. |
2017-01-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H581-583) |
2017-01-23 | House | Mr. Lance moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1534 (Same As) 2017-07-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB4986 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB6147 (Related) 2018-09-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4986 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB6147 (Related) 2018-09-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Federal preemption
Land use and conservation
Science, technology, communications
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Federal preemption
Land use and conservation
Science, technology, communications
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication