US HB6319 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-31 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 676.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-31 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 676.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding Investment in Small Businesses Act This bill directs the Securities and Exchange Commission to report on: (1) the limitiation on shares of an individual company that a diversified investment company may own, and (2) the limitation's impact on capital formation.
Title
Expanding Investment in Small Businesses Act
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 676. |
2018-07-31 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-878. |
2018-07-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-07-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2018-07-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB488 (Related) 2018-07-18 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.