US HB6599 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To modify the application of temporary limited appointment regulations to the National Park Service, and for other purposes.
Title
To modify the application of temporary limited appointment regulations to the National Park Service, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8859) |
2018-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6599. |
2018-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8859-8860) |
2018-09-25 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-09-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 755. |
2018-09-25 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-967. |
2018-09-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |