US HB6610 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interagency Committee on Women's Business Enterprise Act of 2018
Title
Interagency Committee on Women's Business Enterprise Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2018-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB5785 (Related) 2018-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB3042 (Related) 2018-06-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 470.
SB3165 (Same As) 2018-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB5785 (Related) 2018-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB3042 (Related) 2018-06-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 470.
SB3165 (Same As) 2018-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
HR1176 (Similar To) 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Commerce
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Public contracts and procurement
Women in business
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Public contracts and procurement
Women in business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6610/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6610/BILLS-115hr6610ih.pdf |