US HB6784 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Manage our Wolves Act (Sec. 2) This bill addresses the protection of the gray wolf (Canis lupus) under the Endangered Species Act of 1973. Specifically, the Department of the Interior must issue a rule to remove the gray wolf in the contiguous 48 states from the list of endangered or threatened species and reinstate a rule that removed the gray wolf in the Western Great Lakes region from the list. The bill exempts those rules from judicial review as well as a rule that removed the gray wolf in Wyoming from the list.
Title
Manage our Wolves Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-16 - House - On passage RC# 420 (Y: 196 N: 180 NV: 54 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2018-11-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-16 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 196 - 180 (Roll no. 420). (text: CR H9543) |
2018-11-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9550-9551) |
2018-11-16 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule XIX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on H.R. 6784 would be postponed. |
2018-11-16 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2018-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House resumed debate on H.R. 6784. |
2018-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6784. |
2018-11-16 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6784. Provides for consideration of H.R. 6784 under a closed rule, with one motion to recommit allowed. Rule also provides for proceedings during the period from November 19, 2018 through November 26, 2018. |
2018-11-16 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1142. (consideration: CR H9543-9550) |
2018-11-14 | House | Rule H. Res. 1142 passed House. |
2018-11-13 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1142 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6784. Provides for consideration of H.R. 6784 under a closed rule, with one motion to recommit allowed. Rule also provides for proceedings during the period from November 19, 2018 through November 26, 2018. |
2018-11-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 791. |
2018-11-09 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1012. |
2018-09-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 15. |
2018-09-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-09-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1142 (Related) 2018-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6147 (Related) 2018-09-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB6147 (Related) 2018-09-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Animals
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Judicial review and appeals
Mammals
Michigan
Minnesota
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Wisconsin
Wyoming
Animals
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Judicial review and appeals
Mammals
Michigan
Minnesota
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Wisconsin
Wyoming