US HR313 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes that prostate cancer has created a health crisis for African American men. Urges federal agencies to designate additional funds for research and education, awareness, and early detection efforts at the grassroots levels to end such crisis.
Title
Recognizing that the occurrence of prostate cancer in African-American men has reached epidemic proportions and urging Federal agencies to address that health crisis by designating additional funds for research, education, awareness outreach, and early detection.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-06-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SR493 (Related) 2012-06-14 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4206)
SR529 (Related) 2012-07-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5626-5627; text as passed Senate: CR S5626; text of measure as introduced: CR S5493)
SR529 (Related) 2012-07-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5626-5627; text as passed Senate: CR S5626; text of measure as introduced: CR S5493)
Subjects
Cancer
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Minority health
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Minority health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-resolution/313/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hres313/BILLS-112hres313ih.pdf |