US HR92 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of H.B. 1 (American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009). Requires the chair of the Committee on Appropriations to insert in the Congressional Record by February 4, 2009, such material as he may deem explanatory of appropriations measures for FY2009. Authorizes the chair of the Committee on Ways and Means to file, on behalf of the Committee, a supplemental report to accompany H.B. 598 (providing for a portion of the economic recovery package relating to revenue measures, unemployment, and health).
Title
Providing for further consideration of the bill (H.B. 1) making supplemental appropriations for job preservation and creation, infrastructure investment, energy efficiency and science, assistance to the unemployed, and State and local fiscal stabilization, for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2009, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-28 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-01-28 | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 185 (Roll no. 40). (text: CR H607) | |
2009-01-28 | The previous question was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H618) | |
2009-01-28 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 92. | |
2009-01-28 | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H607-618) | |
2009-01-28 | On question of consideration of the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 174 (Roll no. 39). | |
2009-01-28 | POINT OF ORDER - Mr. Stearns raised a point of order against the provisions of H.Res. 92 because it violates the Congressional Budget Act. The Chair announced that the disposition of the point of order would be resolved by the question of consideration of H.Res. 92. The House proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the point of order at the end of which the Chair will put the question on consideration. | |
2009-01-28 | By direction of the Committee on Rules, Ms. Slaughter called up H.Res. 92 and asked for its immediate consideration. | |
2009-01-27 | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 6. | |
2009-01-27 | Resolution provides for further consideration of H.R. 1. Further general debate shall continue for not to exceed one hour, equally divided and controlled and shall be limited to the bill and amendments made in order by this resolution. Upon the adoption of this resolution, the amendment printed in Part A of the report of the Committee on Rules accompanying this resolution shall be considered as adopted. | |
2009-01-27 | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 111-9, by Ms. Slaughter. |
Same As/Similar To
HR88 (Related) 2009-01-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1 (Related) 2009-02-17 - Became Public Law No: 111-5. (TXT | PDF)
HB1 (Related) 2009-02-17 - Became Public Law No: 111-5. (TXT | PDF)