US SB1007 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 621.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 621.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Dayton Aviation Heritage Preservation Act of 1992 to rename a site of the Dayton Aviation Heritage National Historical Park. Amends the Dayton Aviation Heritage Preservation Act of 1992 to rename the John W. Berry, Sr. Wright Brothers Aviation Center, part of the Dayton Aviation Heritage National Historical Park in Dayton, Ohio, as the "John W. Berry, Sr. Wright Brothers National Museum."
Title
A bill to amend the Dayton Aviation Heritage Preservation Act of 1992 to rename a site of the Dayton Aviation Heritage National Historical Park.
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 621. |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 114-346. |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB202 (Same As) 2015-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
HB4909 (Related) 2016-05-26 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 502.
HB4909 (Related) 2016-05-26 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 502.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Historic sites and heritage areas
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Ohio
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Historic sites and heritage areas
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Ohio
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources