US SB1751 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Preserving Access to Manufactured Housing Act of 2017 This bill amends the Truth in Lending Act (TILA) to specify that a retailer of manufactured housing is generally not a "mortgage originator" subject to requirements under that Act. Similarly, the bill amends the Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act of 2008 to specify that such a retailer is generally not a "loan originator" subject to requirements under that Act. In addition, the bill increases the annual percentage rates and transaction values at which mortgages for certain dwellings are considered "high-cost mortgages" under TILA.
Title
Preserving Access to Manufactured Housing Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB10 (Related) 2017-07-13 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-108.
HB1699 (Related) 2017-12-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3280 (Related) 2017-07-26 - Committee on Appropriations Senate Subcommittee on Financial Services and General Government. Hearings held on the subject prior to measure being received from the House. Hearings printed: S. Hrg. 115-191.
HR635 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1699 (Related) 2017-12-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3280 (Related) 2017-07-26 - Committee on Appropriations Senate Subcommittee on Financial Services and General Government. Hearings held on the subject prior to measure being received from the House. Hearings printed: S. Hrg. 115-191.
HR635 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1751/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1751/BILLS-115s1751is.pdf |