US SB21 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 239.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 239.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulations from the Executive in Need of Scrutiny Act of 2017 This bill revises provisions relating to congressional review of agency rulemaking. A federal agency promulgating a rule must publish information about the rule in the Federal Register and include in its report to Congress and to the Government Accountability Office: (1) a classification of the rule as a major or nonmajor rule, and (2) a copy of the cost-benefit analysis of the rule that includes an analysis of any jobs added or lost. A "major rule" is any rule that the Office of Information and Regulatory Affairs of the Office of Management and Budget finds results in: (1) an annual effect on the economy of $100 million or more; (2) a major increase in costs or prices for consumers, individual industries, government agencies, or geographic regions; or (3) significant adverse effects on competition, employment, investment, productivity, innovation, or the ability of U.S.-based enterprises to compete with foreign-based enterprises. A joint resolution of approval must be enacted within 70 session days or legislative days after the agency proposing a major rule submits its report on such rule to Congress in order for the rule to take effect. A major rule may take effect for 90 days without such approval if the President determines it is necessary because of an imminent threat to health or safety or other emergency, for the enforcement of criminal laws, for national security, or to implement an international trade agreement. The bill sets forth the congressional approval procedure for major rules and the congressional disapproval procedure for nonmajor rules. A joint resolution addressing a report classifying a rule as a major rule must be introduced within three legislative days in the House of Representative and three session days in the Senate. The bill prohibits any amendments to, and provides for expedited consideration of, such a joint resolution. A court may review whether an agency has completed the necessary requirements under this bill for a rule to take effect. The bill limits the effect of a joint resolution of approval of a major rule. The Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 is amended to provide that any congressional approval procedure set forth in this bill affecting budget authority, outlays, or receipts shall be assumed to be effective unless it is not approved in accordance with this bill.
Title
Regulations from the Executive in Need of Scrutiny Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Luther Strange [R-AL] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 239. |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-169. Minority views filed. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB26 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-21.
HB3442 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB6147 (Related) 2018-09-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB3442 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB6147 (Related) 2018-09-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Business investment and capital
Competition and antitrust
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Government operations and politics
Industrial policy and productivity
Inflation and prices
Judicial review and appeals
Legislative rules and procedure
Unemployment
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Business investment and capital
Competition and antitrust
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Government operations and politics
Industrial policy and productivity
Inflation and prices
Judicial review and appeals
Legislative rules and procedure
Unemployment