US SR353 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5756)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5756)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes September 24, 2019, as National Voter Registration Day and encourages those eligible to vote to register, verify their personal information on record with local election officials, and vote.
Title
A resolution recognizing September 24, 2019, as "National Voter Registration Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5756) |
Same As/Similar To
HR571 (Related) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SR719 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5881; text: CR S5876)
HR1099 (Related) 2020-09-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SR719 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5881; text: CR S5876)
HR1099 (Related) 2020-09-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
State and local government operations
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/353/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres353/BILLS-116sres353ats.pdf |