US SR422 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration CR S1321; text: CR S1319)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration CR S1321; text: CR S1319)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating March 2, 2018, as "Read Across America Day". Designates March 2, 2018, as Read Across America Day. Honors all authors for their successes in encouraging children to discover the joy of reading. Honors the 21st anniversary of Read Across America Day. Encourages parents, educators, and communities to read with their children for at least 30 minutes on Read Across America Day.
Title
A resolution designating March 2, 2018, as "Read Across America Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration CR S1321; text: CR S1319) |
Same As/Similar To
HR168 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR753 (Related) 2018-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR79 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1583, S1585; text as passed Senate: CR S1583)
HR753 (Related) 2018-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR79 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1583, S1585; text as passed Senate: CR S1583)
Subjects
Art, artists, authorship
Books and print media
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Language arts
Books and print media
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Language arts
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/422/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres422/BILLS-115sres422ats.pdf |