US SR719 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1-1)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5881; text: CR S5876)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5881; text: CR S5876)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes September 22, 2020, as National Voter Registration Day and encourages those eligible to vote to register, verify their personal information on record with local election officials, and vote.
Title
A resolution recognizing September 22, 2020, as "National Voter Registration Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5881; text: CR S5876) |
Same As/Similar To
HR571 (Related) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HR1099 (Related) 2020-09-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SR353 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5756)
HR1099 (Related) 2020-09-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SR353 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5756)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
State and local government operations
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/719/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres719/BILLS-116sres719ats.pdf |