UT HB0063 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tire Recycling Fee Modification
Title
Tire Recycling Fee Modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE | |
2010-02-23 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-03 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-01-27 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTNAE | |
2010-01-25 | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE | |
2010-01-19 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-14 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-07 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2009-12-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2009-11-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC |