UT HB0063 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Left-hand Turn Penalty and Sentencing Requirements
Title
Left-hand Turn Penalty and Sentencing Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-03 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTTRA | |
2011-01-27 | House/ to standing committee in HSTTRA | |
2011-01-26 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-25 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-20 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-01-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0063.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/hbillint/hb0063.pdf |