UT HB0063 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Distracted Driver Amendments
Title
Distracted Driver Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2015-03-12 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-12 | House | House/ circled in House Concurrence Calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2015-03-12 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-12 | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-12 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 3 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Transportation and Public Utilities and Technology Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation and Public Utilities and Technology Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in Senate Transportation and Public Utilities and Technology Committee |
2015-03-03 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Transportation and Public Utilities and Technology Committee |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation and Public Utilities and Technology Committee |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-02-27 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2015-02-27 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2015-02-27 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-27 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-27 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-17 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-17 | House | House/ floor amendment failed in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-17 | House | House/ floor amendment in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-17 | House | House/ floor amendment failed in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-17 | House | House/ floor amendment in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-17 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-02-09 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Transportation Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | House Comm - Held in House Transportation Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2015-01-26 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House | |
2015-01-06 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2014-12-22 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2014-12-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |