UT HB0063 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Office of Rail Safety
Title
Office of Rail Safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-03-13 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-03-13 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-02 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-02 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-02 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-02 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2023-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2023-03-01 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ uncircled in House Concurrence Calendar |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ circled in House Concurrence Calendar |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-02-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-13 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-09 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-08 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-08 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Transportation Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Transportation Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-04 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-12-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Rulemaking
Department of Transportation
New Rulemaking Authority
Public Safety
Railroads
Transportation
Department of Transportation
New Rulemaking Authority
Public Safety
Railroads
Transportation