UT HB0174 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Senate/ to House in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Senate/ to House in HCLERK
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
License Plates Amendments
Title
License Plates Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Greiner [R] | Rep. Paul Ray [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2010-02-22 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-02-22 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-19 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-16 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTTRA | |
2010-02-12 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTTRA | |
2010-02-10 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-08 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |