UT HJR015 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution -- Municipal Water Amendment
Title
Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution -- Municipal Water Amendment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House Comm - Held in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House Comm - Held in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Municipal Government
Natural Resources
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Resolutions
Resolutions, Constitutional
Water and Irrigation
Natural Resources
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Resolutions
Resolutions, Constitutional
Water and Irrigation