UT HJR015 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Recognizing the Employment First Initiative
Title
Joint Resolution Recognizing the Employment First Initiative
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-10 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-04 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-02 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-22 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-22 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-13 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-09 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-09 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-09 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Antidiscrimination
Department of Human Services
Disabilities
Economic Development
Health
Human Services
Labor and Employment
Legislative Operations
Resolutions
Services for People with Disabilities
Department of Human Services
Disabilities
Economic Development
Health
Human Services
Labor and Employment
Legislative Operations
Resolutions
Services for People with Disabilities