VA HB1 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-8)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
Pending: Senate Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund; joint subcommittee. Increases the maximum amount of covered expenses that may be paid to certain crime victims to $30,000 from $25,000 and the maximum amount of an emergency award to $3,000 from $2,000. The bill requires the Chairmen of the House Appropriations and Senate Finance Committees to appoint a joint subcommittee of the membership of such committees to consider the administration, provision and funding of sexual and domestic violence services in the Commonwealth. The joint subcommittee will examine current grant funding structures at state agencies for federal and state funds used to support sexual and domestic violence service agencies and will review the grant applications, administration, and reporting processes required of local sexual and domestic violence agencies and may recommend a comprehensive and streamlined grant funding process for a more efficient funding structure to best serve the victims of sexual and domestic violence while ensuring compliance with federal requirements, including the possible administration of such structure at the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund.
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund; emergency award to claimant shall not exceed $3000, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104953D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104953D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-11-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-11-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100790D |