VA HB1001 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0116)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0116)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amending death certificates. Requires the State Registrar, upon receipt of an affidavit and supporting evidence testifying to corrected information on a death certificate within 45 days of the filing of a death certificate, to amend such death certificate to reflect the new information and evidence. The bill also requires the State Registrar, upon receipt of an affidavit and supporting evidence testifying to corrected demographic information on a death certificate more than 45 days after the filing of a death certificate, to amend such death certificate to reflect the new information and evidence.
Title
Death certificates; State Registrar to amend certificates after receiving corrected information.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Runion [R] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0116) | |
2022-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 116 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1001ER) |
2022-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 22103716D-E |
2022-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1001E |
2022-02-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103716D |
Same As/Similar To
SB55 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)
SB55 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)
SB55 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)