VA HB1002 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
New River Valley Emergency Communications Regional Authority. Authorizes the Towns of Blacksburg and Christiansburg, the County of Montgomery, and Virginia Tech to create the New River Valley Emergency Communications Regional Authority. The purposes of such Authority shall be to develop a consolidated system for the receipt and response of 9-1-1 emergency calls and communications that will improve response-time, quality of service, and coordination of available resources for the citizens of the affected localities.
Title
New River Valley Emergency Communications Regional Authority; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 638 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-12 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1002ER) | |
2010-03-12 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Printed as engrossed 10100655D-E | |
2010-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1002E | |
2010-02-11 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-09 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100655D |
Same As/Similar To
SB433 (Same As) 2010-03-13 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 123 (effective 7/1/10)