VA HB1002 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agriculture and Forestry Industries Development Planning Grant Program. Authorizes the Governor to award grants from the existing Governor's Agriculture and Forestry Industries Development Fund to encourage efforts by political subdivisions to support agriculture and forestry. The bill creates the Agriculture and Forestry Industries Development Planning Grant Program, authorizes the Governor to award reimbursable grants to political subdivisions through the Program, and directs the Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry to administer and develop guidelines for the Program, including a local matching fund requirement. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Agriculture and Forestry Industries Development Planning Grant Program; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1220) | |
2020-04-22 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1220 (effective 4/22/20) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1002ER2) |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-04-22 | Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation | |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: (95-Y 0-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1002ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102701D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |