VA HB1015 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; bid match preference for Virginia businesses. Provides, for contracts not expected to exceed $5 million, a bid match preference for Virginia business. Under the bill, a Virginia business has an opportunity to match the lowest bid of an out-of-state bidder if the bid of a Virginia business is within five percent or $10,000, whichever is less, of the lowest bid of an out-of-state bidder. The bill also provides that to be deemed a resident of Virginia, a Virginia person, firm, or corporation must have paid unemployment taxes or income taxes in Virginia in addition to being organized pursuant to Virginia law or maintaining a principal place of business within Virginia. The bill has a three-year sunset provision.
Title
Public Procurement Act; bid match preference for State businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB334-Villanueva) by voice vote | |
2012-01-27 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103929D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB1015 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB1015+hil |