VA HB1015 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Trespass; signs prohibiting trespass. Provides that a nonresidential building shall not be considered to be posted no trespassing with regard to signs prohibiting the carrying of a firearm or a particular type of firearm unless such signs (i) have been posted where they may reasonably be seen at all entrances to the building or to the part of the building to which the restriction applies, (ii) state the nature of the prohibition in conspicuous type, and (iii) have dimensions of at least five inches by seven inches.
Title
Trespass; signs prohibiting firearms posted on nonresidential building.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Berg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | House | Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2014-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101308D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB1015 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1015+hil |