VA HB1016 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sexual assault response teams; participants; FOIA exclusion. Adds the Title IX coordinator; representatives from the office of student affairs, human resources, and counseling services; and a representative of campus security of any institution of higher education in the jurisdiction to the list of persons invited to participate in the annual meeting of a sexual assault response team. The bill also excludes records reflecting the substance of meetings in which individual sexual assault cases are discussed by a sexual assault response team from mandatory disclosure under the Virginia Freedom of Information Act. The findings of a sexual assault response team may be disclosed or published in statistical or other aggregated form that does not disclose the identity of specific individuals.
Title
Sexual assault response teams; participants in annual meeting, FOIA exclusion for records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550) | |
2016-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 550 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1016ER) |
2016-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-07 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (95-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Reconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House |
2016-03-07 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 1-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (11-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16104009D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1627.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |