VA HB1019 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Educational improvement scholarships tax credit program; Educational improvement scholarships tax credit program; pre-kindergarten eligibility. Modifies the educational improvement scholarships tax credit program by including as eligible scholarship recipients children enrolled in or attending nonpublic pre-kindergarten programs. The maximum annual scholarship that a child enrolled in or attending a nonpublic pre-kindergarten program will receive is the lesser of the child's actual educational expenses or the state share of the grant per child under the
Title
Education improvement scholarships; modifies tax credit program, pre-kindergarten eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-01 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (10-Y 12-N) (Y: 10 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Left in Finance |
2016-02-10 | House | Continued to 2017 in Finance by voice vote |
2016-02-08 | House | Tabled in Finance by voice vote |
2016-02-08 | House | Reconsidered by Finance |
2016-02-01 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (10-Y 12-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103938D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |