VA HB1030 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Issuing citations; marijuana and certain traffic offenses. Removes the provisions that provide that no law-enforcement officer may lawfully stop a motor vehicle for operating (i) without a light illuminating a license plate, (ii) with defective and unsafe equipment, (iii) without brake lights or a high mount stop light, (iv) without an exhaust system that prevents excessive or unusual levels of noise, (v) with certain sun-shading materials and tinting films, and (vi) with certain objects suspended in the vehicle, and the accompanying exclusionary provisions. The bill also repeals the provision that provides that no law-enforcement officer may lawfully stop, search, or seize any person, place, or thing solely on the basis of the odor of marijuana and that no evidence discovered or obtained as a result of such unlawful search or seizure shall be admissible in any trial, hearing, or other proceeding. Issuing citations; marijuana and certain traffic offenses. Removes the provisions that provide that no law-enforcement officer may lawfully stop a motor vehicle for operating (i) without a light illuminating a license plate, (ii) with defective and unsafe equipment, (iii) without brake lights or a high mount stop light, (iv) without an exhaust system that prevents excessive or unusual levels of noise, (v) with certain sun-shading materials and tinting films, and (vi) with certain objects suspended in the vehicle, and the accompanying exclusionary provisions. The bill also repeals the provision that provides that no law-enforcement officer may lawfully stop, search, or seize any person, place, or thing solely on the basis of the odor of marijuana and that no evidence discovered or obtained as a result of such unlawful search or seizure shall be admissible in any trial, hearing, or other proceeding.
Title
Marijuana and certain traffic offenses; issuing citations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2022-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB79-Campbell, R.R.) by voice vote |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101639D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 919 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1013 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1014 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1014.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1049 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1052 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1054 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1094 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1157 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 334.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 646 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 810.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 923 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 926 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |